Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Francis de Mallian

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1747Born
13 Jun 177225.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181770.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
23 Aug 181972.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
28 Oct 1819³72.3DiedBishop-Elect of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Francis de Mallian
Father Jean-Francis de Mallian (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Canourgue

  • a priest for 47.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast