Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Siffrein-Joseph de Salamon

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1750BornCarpentras
3 Aug 180756.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
9 Aug 180756.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
6 Mar 182069.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
29 May 182069.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Jul 182069.7InstalledBishop of Saint-Flour, France
11 Jun 182978.6DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Siffrein-Joseph de Salamon:
Bishop Louis-Siffrein-Joseph de Salamon (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 196, and Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013