Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Vissac

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1383AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
12 Jul 1395AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
23 Jan 1405³DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Vissac
Bishop Pierre Vissac (died ) Bishop of Lavaur

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 518, and Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast