Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond-Marie-Joseph de La Moureyre, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mouila, Gabon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1911Born
29 Jun 193423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 May 195948.1AppointedBishop of Mouila, Gabon
13 Sep 195948.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mouila, Gabon
28 Oct 197665.6ResignedBishop of Mouila, Gabon
14 Feb 199785.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mouila, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Raymond-Marie-Joseph de La Moureyre
Bishop Raymond-Marie-Joseph de La Moureyre C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mouila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Flour, France

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast