Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul de Ribeyre

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1691BornClermont
22 Apr 174250.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
9 Jul 174250.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
12 Aug 174250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
10 Jun 177684.5DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Paul de Ribeyre:
Bishop Paul de Ribeyre (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015