Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Marie-Joseph Usse, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Selge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1860BornSaint-Saturnin, France
20 Sep 188423.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Dec 189333.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
22 Dec 189333.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Selge
1 Apr 189433.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selge
31 Mar 190039.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
21 Apr 190544.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Marie-Joseph Usse:
Bishop Antoine-Marie-Joseph Usse M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013