Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine de Lévis de Château-Morand

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1493¹Born
10 Sep 151623.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
8 Jan 152633.0AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
9 Jan 154855.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint-Flour, France
1566²73.0DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Lévis de Château-Morand
Archbishop Antoine de Lévis de Château-Morand (born 1493, died 1566) Bishop of Saint-Flour

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,516, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast