Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Romero Pose

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

Titular Bishop of Turuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1949BornBayo
27 Jul 197425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
7 Mar 199747.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
7 Mar 199747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuda
1 May 199748.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuda
25 Mar 200758.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Romero Pose:
Bishop Eugenio Romero Pose (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,997
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015