Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Augusto Franco Martínez

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1948 BornPiñuécar
20 May 197324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
14 May 199647.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
14 May 199647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
29 Jun 199647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
12 Nov 201465.9AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
20 Dec 201466.0InstalledBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for César Augusto Franco Martínez:
Bishop César Augusto Franco Martínez (born ) Bishop of Segovia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Segovia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,766
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 12 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014