Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José María Cardinal Bueno y Monreal

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1904BornZaragoza
19 Mar 192722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
25 Nov 194541.2AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
19 Mar 194641.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
13 May 195045.7AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
27 Oct 195450.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Oct 195450.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
8 Apr 195752.6SucceededArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
15 Dec 195854.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 195954.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
22 May 198277.7RetiredArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Aug 198782.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Bueno y Monreal:
Cardinal José María Bueno y Monreal (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
  • a cardinal for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 17
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013