Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago María García de la Rasilla Domínguez, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

Titular Bishop of Voncaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1936Born
14 Jul 196730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Nov 200569.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
11 Nov 200569.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
13 Jan 200669.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncaria
11 Jun 201477.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
13 Aug 201881.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

MicroData Summary for Santiago María García de la Rasilla Domínguez
Bishop Santiago María García de la Rasilla Domínguez S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Diocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained Bishoppatio du Collège San Luis Gonzaga, Jaén, Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Jaén, Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,037
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 13 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast