Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Martínez Camino, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Bigastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1953 Born
24 May 198027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Nov 200754.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
17 Nov 200754.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bigastro
19 Jan 200855.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bigastro

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Martínez Camino
Bishop Juan Antonio Martínez Camino S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz de Marcenado-Siero

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast