Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guerra Campos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1920BornSeares de Abajo
15 Oct 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 196443.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
15 Jun 196443.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
26 Jul 196443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia
13 Apr 197352.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
17 Jun 197352.7InstalledBishop of Cuenca, Spain
26 Jun 199675.7RetiredBishop of Cuenca, Spain
15 Jul 199776.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Guerra Campos:
Bishop José Guerra Campos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015