Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Salvador y Barrera

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1851Born
16 Dec 190150.2AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
20 Apr 190250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
14 Dec 190554.2AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
4 Dec 191665.2AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
23 Mar 191765.5InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
4 Sep 191968.0DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Salvador y Barrera
Archbishop José María Salvador y Barrera (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarchena

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast