Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angel Cardinal Suquía Goicoechea

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid

Cardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1916BornZaldivia
7 Jul 194023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vitoria, Spain
17 May 196649.6AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
16 Jul 196649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
28 Nov 196953.2AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
13 Apr 197356.5AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Apr 198366.5AppointedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
25 May 198568.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198568.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio
28 Jul 199477.8RetiredArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
13 Jul 200689.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Angel Suquía Goicoechea:
Cardinal Angel Suquía Goicoechea (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013