Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustaquio Nieto y Martín

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1866Born
1891²24.8Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
22 Aug 191650.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
27 Dec 191650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
31 Mar 191751.0InstalledBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
27 Jul 193670.3DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustaquio Nieto y Martín
Bishop Eustaquio Nieto y Martín (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast