Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Blanco Granda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Cincari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1914Born
9 Mar 194025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
17 Nov 196954.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
17 Nov 196954.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cincari
21 Dec 196955.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cincari
2 Aug 198671.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Blanco Granda
Bishop Ricardo Blanco Granda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSt. Isidore, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast