Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Palenzuela Velázquez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1919BornValladolid
26 May 194526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
11 Dec 196950.9AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
22 Feb 197051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
12 May 199576.3RetiredBishop of Segovia, Spain
8 Jan 200384.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Palenzuela Velázquez:
Bishop Antonio Palenzuela Velázquez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segovia

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013