Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Pérez y Fernández-Golfin

Deceased

Bishop of Getafe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1931BornMadrid
26 May 195625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
20 Mar 198554.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
20 Mar 198554.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
11 May 198554.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
23 Jul 199160.4AppointedBishop of Getafe, Spain
24 Feb 200473.0DiedBishop of Getafe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Pérez y Fernández-Golfin:
Bishop Francisco José Pérez y Fernández-Golfin (born , died ) Bishop of Getafe

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013