Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Casimiro Morcillo González

Deceased

Archbishop of Madrid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1904Born
18 Dec 192622.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 194338.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
25 Jan 194338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
9 May 194339.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
13 May 195046.2AppointedBishop of Bilbao, Spain
21 Sep 195551.6AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Mar 196460.1AppointedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
30 May 197167.3DiedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Morcillo González
Archbishop Casimiro Morcillo González (born , died ) Archbishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoto del Real

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018