Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Victoriano Cardinal Guisasola y Menéndez

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1852Born
1876²23.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Real, Spain
15 Jun 189341.1AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
1 Oct 189341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
19 Apr 189744.9AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
16 Dec 190149.6AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
14 Dec 190553.6AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Jan 191461.6AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
1 Jan 191461.6AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
25 May 191462.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Sep 191462.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
2 Sep 192068.3DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Victoriano Guisasola y Menéndez (VIAF: 88839569)
Victoriano Cardinal Guisasola y Menéndez (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Seminary, Chapel, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286, and Page 373
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017