Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
16 Sep 1969 | Born | ||
17 Jun 1995 | 25.7 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain |
23 Apr 2024 | 54.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain |
23 Apr 2024 | 54.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Valliposita |
6 Jul 2024 | 54.8 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Valliposita |
Father
Vicente
Martín Muñoz
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Madrid
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | La Nava de Santiago, Diocese of Badajoz |
Ordained Bishop | Santa María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Madrid.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Apr 2024 |
✠