Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert-Georges-Pierre Rousseau

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1871BornLuché-Pringé
17 Jun 189422.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 192553.9AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
8 Sep 192554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
2 Oct 193968.2DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Norbert-Georges-Pierre Rousseau:
Bishop Norbert-Georges-Pierre Rousseau (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013