Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Cauchon de Maupas

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1604BornSermiers
30 Aug 164136.7SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
22 Jun 164338.6ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
4 Oct 164338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
31 Mar 166459.3AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
12 Aug 168075.7DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Cauchon de Maupas:
Bishop Henri de Cauchon de Maupas (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 85
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015