Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Auguste-Victorin Morlhon

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1799BornVillefranche-de-Rouergue
13 Mar 182424.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 184647.0SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
12 Apr 184747.3ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
30 May 184747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
5 Oct 186262.8DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Auguste-Victorin Morlhon:
Bishop Joseph-Auguste-Victorin Morlhon (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013