Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Marie-Joseph Darcimoles

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1802BornRueyres
23 Dec 182624.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 184037.5SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
13 Jul 184037.6ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
23 Aug 184037.7Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Dec 184644.0SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
12 Apr 184744.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
11 Jan 185754.1DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Joseph Darcimoles:
Archbishop Pierre-Marie-Joseph Darcimoles (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 113
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013