Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Lebrun

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1327AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
18 Oct 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
25 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
14 May 1347AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
29 Oct 1349DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Lebrun
Bishop Bernard Lebrun (died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 91, and Page 373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast