Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Pierre Joseph Cornet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1923Born
18 Dec 194825.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 197854.3AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
23 Apr 197854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
31 Jul 198763.7AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
17 Aug 199975.7RetiredBishop of Meaux, France
11 Sep 200682.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Pierre Joseph Cornet
Bishop Louis Pierre Joseph Cornet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuits-Saint-Georges

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast