Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fabra

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne

Note/Previous Titular See: Anicien


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1356AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
27 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
10 Jan 1362AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
1371¹DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fabra:
Bishop Juan Fabra , Bishop of Carcassonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 166, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014