Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Girard, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo

Titular Bishop of Bulla Regia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1863BornCistrières, France
19 Jun 188623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of African Missions
19 Sep 188623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
191652.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
8 Jul 192158.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
8 Jul 192158.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
23 Oct 192158.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
13 Nov 192158.5InstalledVicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
23 Mar 195086.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt

MicroData Summary for Jules Girard:
Bishop Jules Girard S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 74
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013