Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph de Galard de Terraube

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1736Born
12 Feb 177437.7SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
6 Jun 177438.0ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
24 Jul 177438.1Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
28 Oct 177438.4InstalledBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
8 Oct 180468.3DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph de Galard de Terraube (VIAF: 2581047)
Bishop Marie-Joseph de Galard de Terraube (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLectoure

  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast