Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Chausse, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kouangtong, China

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1838Born
1859¹20.8ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
14 Jun 186224.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
16 Dec 188042.8AppointedCoadjutor Prefect of Kouangtong, China
16 Dec 188042.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
25 Jul 188143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
6 Apr 188648.1SucceededPrefect of Kouangtong, China
12 Oct 190062.6DiedPrefect of Kouangtong, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Chausse
Bishop Augustin Chausse M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Kouangtong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Didier-la-Séauve, France

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017