Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre de Gallien de Chabons

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1756BornGrenoble
23 Dec 178024.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181761.3SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
1 Oct 181761.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
10 Apr 182265.9SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
27 Sep 182266.4ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
17 Nov 182266.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
9 Nov 183781.5RetiredBishop of Amiens, France
24 Oct 183882.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre de Gallien de Chabons:
Bishop Jean-Pierre de Gallien de Chabons (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amiens

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 70, and Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013