Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Georges Lefranc de Pompignan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1715BornMontauban
17 Dec 174227.8SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
15 Jul 174328.3ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Aug 174328.4Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
19 Nov 174328.7InstalledBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
30 Jan 177458.9SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
14 Apr 177459.1ResignedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
9 May 177459.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
14 Dec 178974.8ResignedArchbishop of Vienne, France
30 Dec 179075.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Georges Lefranc de Pompignan:
Archbishop Jean-Georges Lefranc de Pompignan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne

  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 85, and Page 441
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015