Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas-François Boutry

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1845BornNeuvy
18 Sep 186923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Moulins, France
5 Jun 190761.6AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
24 Jun 190761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
20 Mar 192579.4DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Thomas-François Boutry:
Bishop Thomas-François Boutry (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013