Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cayetano Paravicino, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1690³Born
16 Nov 173848.4AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
2 Jul 174151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
14 Jul 174757.1SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
4 Sep 174757.2ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
20 Oct 175060.3DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cayetano Paravicino
Bishop José Cayetano Paravicino O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast