Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Encarnación

Dioecesis Sanctissimae Incarnationis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 April 1990
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Asunción
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 16,525 (6,382 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Gral. Cabanas 305, Casilla 81, Encarnacion, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (071)20.33.05
  • Fax: 20.37.77

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná
21 January 1957ErectedDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Diocese of Villarrica
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná (erected)
25 March 1968SplitTerritorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
25 March 1968SplitTerritorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
Diocese of Encarnación
19 April 1990ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Encarnación Diocese of Encarnación

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación y Alto Paraná
1966200,000220,00090.9%639454,444102618ap1967
Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
1970196,086207,11694.7%634404,902453919ap1971
1976206,000226,40091.0%639454,577465922ap1977
1980277,200308,00090.0%640466,026469225ap1981
Diocese of Encarnación
1990343,500380,00090.4%1233457,6335312131ap1991
1999437,181478,79891.3%1728459,71513412730ap2000
2000440,025515,60085.3%1828469,56513211830ap2001
2001440,237516,47385.2%1633498,9841389330ap2002
2002435,984519,76983.9%1535508,7191409530ap2003
2003425,643519,76981.9%1334479,0561409031ap2004
2004420,356519,76980.9%1033439,7751428831ap2005
2006441,000546,00080.8%12324410,0221428230ap2007
2013502,000611,00082.2%1834529,6531387233ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.4, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 21 Dec 2014