Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Pastor Bogarín Argaña

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1911Born
16 Apr 193827.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 195443.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
1 Dec 195443.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
19 Mar 195543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
19 Jan 195745.8AppointedBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
3 Sep 197665.4DiedBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Ramón Pastor Bogarín Argaña
Bishop Ramón Pastor Bogarín Argaña (born , died ) Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYpacaraí
Ordained BishopAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast