Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Juan Aponte

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1820Born
4 Aug 185232.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Oct 185232.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 187959.0AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
19 Oct 187959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
14 Sep 189171.2DiedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

MicroData Summary for Pedro Juan Aponte
Bishop Pedro Juan Aponte (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuiquio
Ordained BishopAssomption, Paraguay, Diocese of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast