Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo

Apostolicus Vicariatus Pilcomayoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lucio Alfert, O.M.I., Vicar Apostolic

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 14 July 1950
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 125,000 (48,281 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.vicpilcomayo.org.py/
  • Mailing Address: Mariscal Estigarribia, C.C. 455, Asuncion, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (0494)24.72.16
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo
12 February 1925ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Chaco Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo (erected)
1 May 1929Territory LostDiocese of Paraguay
Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo
Diocese of Concepción y Chaco (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo
14 July 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo
28 June 1980Territory LostDiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo
Diocese of Benjamín Aceval (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo
195026,00050,00052.0%12122,1662361ap1951
196440,00060,00066.7%16162,5002578ap1967
1970181803220ap1971
197650,00077,67964.4%16163,125352010ap1977
198050,00080,00062.5%215172,9412312811ap1981
199015,30049,40031.0%991,70019223ap1991
199933,00061,50053.7%19103,30017284ap2000
200034,00075,00045.3%1893,77715294ap2001
200134,30075,00045.7%19103,43016295ap2002
200234,30075,00045.7%1784,28714305ap2003
200435,00075,00046.7%19103,50016295ap2005
201038,70083,00046.6%28103,87012285ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 22 Jul 2012