Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Velasco y Maeda, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1724³Born
12 Jul 177955.3AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
1780²55.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
15 Jun 179268.2DiedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Velasco y Maeda
Bishop Luis Velasco y Maeda O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 98, Number 503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast