Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Sosa Gaona, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Sergentza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1884BornAsunción
28 Jan 191227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Apr 193146.6AppointedBishop of Concepción y Chaco, Paraguay
15 May 193247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción y Chaco, Paraguay
14 May 196378.6RetiredBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
14 May 196378.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergentza
24 Mar 197085.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Emilio Sosa Gaona:
Bishop Emilio Sosa Gaona S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013