Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro García de Panés, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1758Born
23 Mar 180749.1AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
21 May 180951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
13 Oct 183880.7DiedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

MicroData Summary for Pedro García de Panés
Bishop Pedro García de Panés O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJarandilla, Diocese of Plasencia, Spain
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Diocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,809, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,828
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 128, Number 684

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast