Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino de Cárdenas Ponce, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Aug 1640AppointedBishop of Paraguay
14 Oct 1641Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay
7 Jun 1666AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1668DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Bernardino de Cárdenas Ponce:
Bishop Bernardino de Cárdenas Ponce O.F.M. Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a bishop for 26.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 270
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013