Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Adolfo Carlos Livieres Banks

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1929Born
22 Dec 195627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
12 Oct 197647.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
12 Oct 197647.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimmira
25 Nov 197647.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimmira
24 Jul 198758.4AppointedPrelate of Encarnación, Paraguay
19 Apr 199061.1AppointedBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
5 Jul 200374.3ResignedBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
17 Dec 201889.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Encarnación, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Jorge Adolfo Carlos Livieres Banks
Bishop Jorge Adolfo Carlos Livieres Banks (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Encarnación

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción
Death PlaceAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast