Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Sinforiano Bogarín

Deceased

Archbishop of Asunción, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1863Born
24 Feb 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 189431.0AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
3 Feb 189531.4Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
1 May 192965.6AppointedArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
25 Feb 194985.5DiedArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Juan Sinforiano Bogarín (VIAF: 38396565)
Archbishop Juan Sinforiano Bogarín (born , died ) Archbishop of Asunción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbuyapey
Ordained BishopCathedral, Asunción, Diocese of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 54.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018