Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Palos Bord, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1666³BornMorella, Spain
24 Sep 172155.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Paraguay
24 Sep 172155.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Talia
24 Jan 172356.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talia
1724¹57.3SucceededBishop of Paraguay
4 Apr 173871.6DiedBishop of Paraguay

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Palos Bord:
Bishop José Luis Palos Bord O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,866
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102, and Page 367
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,707
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 242, Number 1,500
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015