Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Suarez de Cantillana

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1728¹BornSantiago del Estero
18 Dec 179769.9AppointedBishop of Paraguay
11 Nov 179870.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay
22 Jan 179971.0DiedBishop of Paraguay

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Suarez de Cantillana:
Bishop Lorenzo Suarez de Cantillana (died ) Bishop of Paraguay

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,918
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015