Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph S. Thumma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vijayawada, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1918Born
21 Dec 195234.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 197051.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vijayawada, India
2 Jan 197051.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cunga Féichin
7 May 197051.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cunga Féichin
23 Jan 197152.0SucceededBishop of Vijayawada, India
8 Nov 199677.8RetiredBishop of Vijayawada, India
18 Aug 199778.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vijayawada, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph S. Thumma
Bishop Joseph S. Thumma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vijayawada

EventPlace
Birth PlacePathur
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pondicherry, Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast