Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Paul Marie Valentin

Auxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France

Titular Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1972 Born
27 Jun 199927.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Versailles, France
29 Jun 200028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
14 Dec 201846.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
14 Dec 201846.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaison
20 Jan 201946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaison

MicroData Summary for Bruno Paul Marie Valentin
Bishop Bruno Paul Marie Valentin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Versailles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 14 Dec 2018
  • c0+/loc: AJ, 3 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Jan 2019

Quantcast